skip to content

Keren, Arieh Eric

CPSO#: 88078

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Melbourne, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Keren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Feb 2008 to 25 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2008 to 24 Feb 2009
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2012