THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:07:51 PM
Keren, Arieh Eric
CPSO#:
88078
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
01 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. Keren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Feb 2008 to 25 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2008 to 24 Feb 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 25 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2012 |