skip to content

Kennedy, James Allan Mark

CPSO#: 93149

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing, 2nd floor
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5847
Fax: (416) 480-6002 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DR. JAMES KENNEDY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kennedy ( CPSO# 93149 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: 416-480-5847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective:30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES ALLAN MARK KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2019