THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:03:42 PM
Kennedy, James Allan Mark
CPSO#:
93149
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing, 2nd floor
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5847
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:30 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES ALLAN MARK KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2019 |