skip to content

Keng, Christine Jia-Shin

CPSO#: 95532

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10083 Keele Street
Suite 200
Maple ON  L6A 3Y8
Phone: 905-918-0960
Fax: 905-918-0961 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. C. Keng & D. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Keng ( CPSO# 95532 )
Dr. D. Chu ( CPSO# 103349)

Business Address:
10 Trench Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JIA-SHIN KENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016