skip to content

Chu, Derek Kuo-Cheng

CPSO#: 103349

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West, Room 3V49
Health Sciences Centre
McMaster University
Clinical Immunology & Allergy
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76374
Fax: (905) 521-4971 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Canada
Fax: 905-508-1087
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. C. Keng & D. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Keng ( CPSO# 95532 )
Dr. D. Chu ( CPSO# 103349)

Business Address:
Suite 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8

Business Address:
10 Trench Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:04 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEREK KUO-CHENG CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018