skip to content

Kehoe, Shannon Brigid

CPSO#: 94947

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 The Parkway
Kanata ON  K2K 1T1
Phone: 613-319-7996
Fax: 613-271-8998 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shannon Kehoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Sep 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANNON BRIGID KEHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEHOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2011 to 02 May 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2021