THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:45:41 PM
Kehoe, Shannon Brigid
CPSO#:
94947
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Shannon Kehoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Sep 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2011 to 02 May 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 30 Apr 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 19 Oct 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 03 Jun 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2023 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 08 Nov 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 08 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |