skip to content

Kealy, Ciaran Liam Thomas

CPSO#: 24239

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
57 Kincora Court
Sudbury ON  P3E 2B9
Phone: (705) 674-7869
Fax: (705) 597-2030 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ciaran Kealy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kealy ( CPSO# 24239 )

Business Address:
57 Kincora Court
Sudbury ON  P3E 2B9
Phone Number: (705) 674-7869

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CIARAN LIAM THOMAS KEALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEALY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1971
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.