THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:34:49 AM
Kealy, Ciaran Liam Thomas
CPSO#:
24239
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
14 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ciaran Kealy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2019 |