skip to content

Kazazian, Karineh

CPSO#: 90817

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:09 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective:09 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARINEH KAZAZIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZAZIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2021