THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:21:02 PM
Kazazian, Karineh
CPSO#:
90817
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Apr 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital, Universit
10 Eaton North, Room 214
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 3444
Fax: 416 603 5714
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARINEH KAZAZIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZAZIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - General Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2021 |