skip to content

Kathuria, Chanchal

CPSO#: 86059

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 16
585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone: (905) 693-9500
Fax: (905) 693-8600 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sangeet Kathuria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kathuria ( CPSO# 83468 )
Dr. C. Kathuria ( CPSO# 86059 )

Business Address:
Suites 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHANCHAL KATHURIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHURIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 17 Jun 2007
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2010