THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:05:59 PM
Kathuria, Chanchal
CPSO#:
86059
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Gandhi Medical College, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 16
585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON L9T 2N2
Phone: (905) 693-9500
Fax: (905) 693-8600
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Apr 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHANCHAL KATHURIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHURIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 17 Jun 2007
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2010 |