skip to content

Kassam, Yasmin Badrudin

CPSO#: 30923

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut
USA - Georgia
USA - South Carolina
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASMIN BADRUDIN KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1979