THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:40:41 AM
Kassam, Yasmin Badrudin
CPSO#:
30923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
USA - Georgia
USA - South Carolina
USA - Washington
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:08 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMIN BADRUDIN KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1979 |