Karatela, Kamran Ahmed (CPSO#: 94953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Apr 2011

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Karmy Chronic Pain Medical Clinic
5927 Bathurst St
North York ON  M2R 3T5
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

72 victoria avenue
Chatham ON  N7L3A1
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karatela, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Karatela ( CPSO# 94953 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Department of Internal Medicine
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B5
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
72 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Kamran Ahmed Karatela may practise:

                  (i)   medicine independently in internal medicine, only; and
                  
                  (ii)  pain  medicine  at the Karmy Chronic Pain Medical Clinic located in
                        Toronto and Brampton,  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                        by a supervisor acceptable  to  the College, and only in accordance
                        with the Change of Scope Program approved by the College.
                  
            2.    Under  clause  1(ii),  Dr.  Karatela will not  be  the  most  responsible
                  physician for any patients.

            3.    The authority to practice in  clause 1(ii) automatically expires upon the
                  following   events,  unless  the  Registration   Committee   renews   the
                  certificate with  or  without  additional  or other terms, conditions and
                  limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Karatela's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the  required  reports to the College by the due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Karatela's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College  finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Karatela's practice unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (iv)  Dr. Karatela is  no  longer  participating  in  the Change of Scope
                        Program.