THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:25:31 AM
Karatela, Kamran Ahmed
CPSO#:
94953
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
33-335 King St W
336 King Street West
Chatham ON N7M 1G2
Phone: 5193975618
Fax: 2263122051
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Apr 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Apr 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2022 |
|
Active |