Kamath, Amisha Thulasidas (CPSO#: 99587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jun 2014

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102-9715 James Potter Road
Brampton ON  L6X 3B9
Phone: (905) 457-5800
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amisha Kamath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kamath ( CPSO# 99587 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
9715 James Potter Road
Brampton ON  L6X 3B9
Phone Number: (905) 457-5800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Amisha  Thulasidas  Kamath  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.