skip to content

Kamath, Amisha Thulasidas

CPSO#: 99587

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jun 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11-450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: 519 7254070 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amisha Kamath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kamath ( CPSO# 99587 )

Business Address:
450 Westheights Drive
Suite 11
Kitchener ON  N2N 1Y8
Phone Number: (519) 725-4070

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active
             Dr.  Amisha  Thulasidas  Kamath  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.