skip to content

Kalidindi, Shiva Kumar Raju

CPSO#: 88319

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Bangalore University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shiva Kalidindi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2013