THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:02:32 AM
Kalidindi, Shiva Kumar Raju
CPSO#:
88319
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Bangalore University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Shiva Kalidindi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2013 |