skip to content

Kaila, Brinderjit Kaur

CPSO#: 86608

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York Endoscopy
Unit B19
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 645-5145
Fax: (416) 645-1401 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Promed Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
Fax: (416) 634-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

790 Bay St
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
PO Box 71
Suite 700
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-551-6006
Fax: 416-551-6009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brinderjit Kaila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kaila ( CPSO# 86608 )

Business Address:
North York Endoscopy
Unit B19
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 645-5145

Business Address:
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRINDERJIT KAUR KAILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAILA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2007