THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:24:17 PM
Kaila, Brinderjit Kaur
CPSO#:
86608
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Manitoba, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
790 Bay St
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
PO Box 71
Suite 700
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 416-551-6006
Fax: 416-551-6009
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:02 Oct 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRINDERJIT KAUR KAILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAILA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2007 |