skip to content

Tzanetos, Katina

CPSO#: 71301

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Ground Floor Eaton Wing
Medical Education Room 001
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6057 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Tzanetos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tzanetos ( CPSO# 71301 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 224, 14 Eaton North
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATINA TZANETOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TZANETOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001