skip to content

Shufelt, Kathryn Anne

CPSO#: 74862

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Macdonald, Kathryn Anne (used until: 12 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5155 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Shufelt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shufelt ( CPSO# 74862 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:10 Nov 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE SHUFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUFELT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 10 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004