skip to content

Juta, Manikant Maganlall

CPSO#: 92572

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Manikant M. Juta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Manikant Maganlall Juta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 17, 2016:

Dr. Juta was the subject of College investigations into his long term care practice and family practice, and clinical deficiencies have been identified. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Juta will cease to engage in long term care practice.
• Dr. Juta will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Juta will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping.
• Dr. Juta’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.