THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:49:17 AM
Juta, Manikant Maganlall
CPSO#:
92572
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Bombay, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Manikant M. Juta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jul 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Manikant Maganlall Juta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 17, 2016:
Dr. Juta was the subject of College investigations into his long term care practice and family practice, and clinical deficiencies have been identified. As a result of the investigation:
• Dr. Juta will cease to engage in long term care practice.
• Dr. Juta will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Juta will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping.
• Dr. Juta’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.