skip to content

Juriansz, Allan Russell

CPSO#: 23394

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Feb 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B17
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 645-1978 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLAN RUSSELL JURIANSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JURIANSZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1973