THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:11:14 AM
Juriansz, Allan Russell
CPSO#:
23394
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Apr 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit B17
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 645-1978
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:17 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLAN RUSSELL JURIANSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JURIANSZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1965 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1966 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 May 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1973 |