skip to content

Johnson, Taylor Alexander

CPSO#: 98063

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Emergency Department
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: (519) 352-8002 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stratford General Hospital
Emergency Department
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T.A. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Johnson ( CPSO# 98043 )
Dr. T. Johnson ( CPSO# 98063 )

Business Address:
139 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Phone Number: (519) 227-1268

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
3-59 King Street West
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone Number: (519) 786-4545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAYLOR ALEXANDER JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014