THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:19:25 AM
Johnson, Taylor Alexander
CPSO#:
98063
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
Emergency Department
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: 519-272-8200
Fax: 519-272-8243
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAYLOR ALEXANDER JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2014 |