skip to content

Johnson, Frank Gordon

CPSO#: 15834

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 Jul 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Mar 1980
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Jul 1993

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jul 1993
Summary:

 In July 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Johnson guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  The Committee further found Dr. Johnson incompetent, as defined in s. 
 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional 
 care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the 
 patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Johnson(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 27 Jul 1993