THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:37:25 AM
Johnson, Frank Gordon
CPSO#:
15834
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
28 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of London, 1950
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Nov 1959 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1956 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Mar 1980 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 28 Jul 1993 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jul 1993
Summary:
In July 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Johnson guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. The Committee further found Dr. Johnson incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Johnson's licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 27 Jul 1993