Johnson, Anna (CPSO#: 98043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
59 King St E
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone: 519-786-4545
Fax: 519-786-6318
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.A. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Johnson ( CPSO# 98043 )
Dr. T. Johnson ( CPSO# 98063 )

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
3-59 King Street West
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone Number: (519) 786-4545

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jan 2016 to 26 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Feb 2016 to 26 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016