THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:03:45 AM
Johnson, Anna
CPSO#:
98043
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Slovak
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
344 Victoria St
Watford ON N0M 2S0
Phone: 519-876-2520
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNA JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Jan 2016 to 26 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2016 to 26 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2016 |