skip to content

John, Rohan

CPSO#: 88011

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street Suite 11E 225
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4560
Fax: (416) 340-5517 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan John Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. John ( CPSO# 88011 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street Suite 11E-225
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4560

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:07 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011 Active
 Dr.  Rohan  John  may  practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology,
            only.