THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:51:29 AM
John, Rohan
CPSO#:
88011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street Suite 11E 225
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4560
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:07 Aug 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |