skip to content

Jing, Nin

CPSO#: 84821

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Nanjing Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2930 Dominion Blvd. Buidling #1
Windsor ON  N9E 2M8
Phone: (519) 253-2888
Fax: (519) 253-0444 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Jing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jing ( CPSO# 84821 )

Business Address:
2930 Dominion Boulevard
Building 1
Suite 3
Windsor ON  N9E 2M8
Phone Number: (519) 253-2888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIN JING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008