THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:02:21 AM
Jing, Nin
CPSO#:
84821
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Nanjing Medical College, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1800 Tecumseh Rd W
Windsor ON N9B 3T2
Phone: 519-253-2888
Fax: 519-253-0444
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Aug 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIN JING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2008 |