skip to content

Jilani, Amer Mahmood

CPSO#: 89654

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kawartha Regional Memory Clinic
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone: (705) 749-3906
Fax: (705) 749-2778 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5120
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Lakeridge Helath Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4832
Fax: (905) 743-5311
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Glazier Medical Center
11 Gibb Street, Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Fax: (905) 725-3110
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Jilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jilani ( CPSO# 89654 )

Business Address:
Kawartha Regional Medical Clinic
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone Number: (705) 749-3906

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:28 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2008 to 15 Oct 2008
AVP - Geriatric Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Oct 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 May 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011 Active
 Dr.  Amer  Mahmood  Jilani  may  practise  medicine  independently in geriatric
            medicine, only.