THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:12:41 AM
Jilani, Amer Mahmood
CPSO#:
89654
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kawartha Regional Memory Clinic
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON K9H 2P4
Phone: (705) 749-3906
Fax: (705) 749-2778
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Oct 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:28 Oct 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2008 to 15 Oct 2008
AVP - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Oct 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
|
Active |