skip to content

Jeffries, Joseph Joel

CPSO#: 23337

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
11 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact the Centre for Addiction and Mental Health at 250 College Street, Toronto, ON, M5T 1R8; Attention: Hospital Records Department
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 May 2021