THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:44:07 AM
Jeffries, Joseph Joel
CPSO#:
23337
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact the Centre for Addiction and Mental Health at 250 College Street, Toronto, ON, M5T 1R8; Attention: Hospital Records Department
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1966 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 May 2021 |