skip to content

Steinberg, Jeffrey Martin

CPSO#: 31688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 May 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5925 Yonge St
North York ON  M2M 3V7
Phone: (416) 222-2331
Fax: (416) 222-2394 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeffrey Steinberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 May 2023
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 08 May 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 09 May 2023
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 09 Aug 2023

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Steinberg’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Steinberg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician in his conduct and communication with patients, including a physical altercation with a patient.  It is also alleged that Dr. Steinberg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct by failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients; failing to complete and/or return third party reports for a patient; inappropriately ending physician-patient relationship with patients; inappropriately threatening to disclose a patient’s information, including personal health information; asking, suggesting and/or intimidating a patient to withdraw a complaint to the College; in his conduct and communications with the College; in his storage of medical records; and inappropriately threatening to withhold medications and/ or prescriptions for patients.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2023 Active
 As from May 8, 2023, by order of the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal, the following terms, conditions, and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jeffrey Martin Steinberg: 

i. The member will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without condition or qualification. The member will complete the PROBE program within 3 months of the date of this Order or, if it is not available within that timeframe, will complete it at the earliest available opportunity, and will provide proof to the College of their completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within 1 month of completing it.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 08 May 2023
Summary:

On May 8, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Steinberg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of his failure to maintain appropriate boundaries with Patient A, including inviting her to his home by text message and hugging her during a medical appointment.

The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Steinberg attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Steinberg’s certificate of registration for three months commencing May 9, 2023;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Steinberg’s certificate of registration; and
4. Dr. Steinberg pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by June 8, 2023.
 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-05-08