THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:15:56 AM
Steinberg, Jeffrey Martin
CPSO#:
31688
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5925 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3V7
Phone: (416) 222-2331
Fax: (416) 222-2394
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jeffrey Steinberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY MARTIN STEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINBERG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2023 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 09 May 2023 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 09 Aug 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2024 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Steinberg’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Steinberg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician in his conduct and communication with patients, including a physical altercation with a patient. It is also alleged that Dr. Steinberg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct by failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients; failing to complete and/or return third party reports for a patient; inappropriately ending physician-patient relationship with patients; inappropriately threatening to disclose a patient’s information, including personal health information; asking, suggesting and/or intimidating a patient to withdraw a complaint to the College; in his conduct and communications with the College; in his storage of medical records; and inappropriately threatening to withhold medications and/ or prescriptions for patients.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 08 May 2023
Summary:
On May 8, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Steinberg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of his failure to maintain appropriate boundaries with Patient A, including inviting her to his home by text message and hugging her during a medical appointment.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Steinberg attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Steinberg’s certificate of registration for three months commencing May 9, 2023;
3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Steinberg’s certificate of registration; and
4. Dr. Steinberg pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by June 8, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-05-08