skip to content

Jay, Howard

CPSO#: 20631

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Feb 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Feb 2020

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: January 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Jay will be resigning from the College effective February 15, 2020.

Effective immediately, Dr. Jay shall not treat or accept into his practice any new patients.