THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:13:43 AM
Jay, Howard
CPSO#:
20631
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jan 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Jay will be resigning from the College effective February 15, 2020.
Effective immediately, Dr. Jay shall not treat or accept into his practice any new patients.