skip to content

Javaly, Kedarnath

CPSO#: 96853

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Department of Medicine
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: 905 378-4647 Ext. 57800
Fax: (905) 358-3030 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: 705 653-1140 Ext. 2143
Fax: 705 653-3020
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kedarnath Javaly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Javaly ( CPSO# 96853 )

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013 Active
                   Dr.  Kedarnath  Javaly  may  practise  medicine independently in internal
                  medicine as a hospitalist, only.