THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:00:50 PM
Javaly, Kedarnath
CPSO#:
96853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Department of Medicine
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: 905 378-4647 Ext. 57800
Fax: (905) 358-3030
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 04 Feb 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2013 |
|
Active |